TREGARGUS TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HISTORIC, DOMESTIC AND INDUSTRIAL BUILDING SITES AND ARTIFACTS SITUATED IN THE TREGARGUS VALLEY, CORNWALL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income includes £23,559 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 22 January 2016: CIO registration
- 31 March 2016: Funds received from 1084350 THE TREGARGUS TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MORCOM | Chair | 01 January 2002 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Rufus Barrett | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Yvonne Wren | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Milo Bright | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andy Barclay | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARIE Allen | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KIM WONNACOTT | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Wonnacott MBE | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH DOHERTY | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR BILL TRUSCOTT | Trustee | 01 June 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.47k | £3.80k | £5.90k | £13.47k | £28.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69k | £1.34k | £14.21k | £19.46k | £19.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.35k | £2.19k | £3.50k | £5.68k | £23.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HISTORIC, DOMESTIC AND INDUSTRIAL BUILDING SITES AND ARTEFACTS SITUATED IN THE TREGARGUS VALLEY CORNWALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Terras Road
St. Stephen
St. Austell
PL26 7RX
- Phone:
- 01726824323
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window