LEICESTERSHIRE AUTISTIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of autistic people in Leicestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
Governance
- ASPERGER SUPPORT GROUP MONDAY CLUB (Working name)
- ASPERGER SYNDROM SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
- JIGSAW (Working name)
- LOUGHBOROUGH GROUP (Working name)
- SAC CLUB (SIBLINGS ACTIVITY CLUB) (Working name)
- SAC MELTON (Working name)
- THE LEICESTERSHIRE SOCIETY FOR AUTISTIC CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNY CORNWELL | Chair | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Lewis | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mary Matts | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE LESLEY HEUBECK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.91k | £2.67k | £3.75k | £6.44k | £4.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.23k | £1.03k | £2.02k | £10.39k | £10.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS VARIOUSLY DIAGNOSED AS AUTISTIC, APHASIC AND/OR NON-COMMUNICATING.
Area of benefit
THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Linden Avenue
Countesthorpe
LEICESTER
LE8 5PG
- Phone:
- 01162771974
- Email:
- peterholdridge@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window