ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE EAST BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable objects of the RSPCA are to promote kindness and to prevent or suppress cruelty to animals and to do all such lawful acts as the Society may consider to be conducive or incidental to the attainment of those objectives. The RSPCA as a charity will, by all lawful means, prevent cruelty, promote kindness to and alleviate suffering of animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 June 1978: Standard registration
- RSPCA LINCOLNSHIRE EAST BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA LINCOLNSHIRE EAST BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Lucy Bachmann | Chair | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Linda Turner | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Williams | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hoffman | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan SPENCER | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ely | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.25k | £213.13k | £79.58k | £68.47k | £113.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.01k | £99.60k | £108.93k | £155.15k | £130.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.28k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RSPCA Lincs East Branch
PO Box 1257
Spalding
Lincolnshire
PE11 9HX
- Phone:
- 07967565367
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window