SIMON ON THE STREETS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objectives are to: 1) prevent and relieve hardship and need and distress amongst those who are homeless and rootless by the provision of practical and emotional support, in particular but not exclusively to those who are sleeping rough or who are unwilling or unable to accept existing provision; 2) educate the public concerning the problems of social isolation and homelessness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £63,951 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 January 2016: CIO registration
- 26 March 2019: Funds received from 1088245 SIMON ON THE STREETS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Michie | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin Brown | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leo Jones-Rowe | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Liddle | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Wright | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Fraser | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £330.04k | £391.27k | £406.73k | £463.72k | £446.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £287.64k | £360.85k | £469.63k | £432.12k | £410.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.99k | £73.55k | £47.68k | £62.00k | £63.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE HARDSHIP AND NEED AND DISTRESS AMONGST THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS AND ROOTLESS BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THOSE WHO ARE SLEEPING ROUGH, OR WHO ARE UNWILLING OR UNABLE TO ACCEPT EXISTING PROVISION. 2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE PROBLEMS OF SOCIAL ISOLATION AND HOMELESSNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1B & 2A
Crown House
94 Armley Road
Leeds
LS12 2EJ
- Phone:
- 01133452270
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window