Financial history STONEHAGE FLEMING CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169681
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £138.52k £27.50k £99.74k £19.90k £37.33k
Total expenditure £142.15k £39.21k £85.23k £27.41k £35.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A