STONEHAGE FLEMING CHARITABLE FOUNDATION


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 07 May 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE SFCF IS TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ANY COUNTRY OR COUNTRIES IN THE WORLD ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Israel
- Jersey
- Luxembourg
- South Africa
- Switzerland
Governance
- 14 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EXMOOR FIDUCIARY LIMITED | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.52k | £27.50k | £99.74k | £19.90k | £37.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.15k | £39.21k | £85.23k | £27.41k | £35.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ANY COUNTRY OR COUNTRIES IN THE WORLD ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Exmoor Fiduciary Limited
6 St James's Square
LONDON
SW1Y 4JU
- Phone:
- 020 7087 0000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window