EBENEZER CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES CHRISTIAN SERVICES AS A CHURCH FACILITATING ACTIVITIES SUCH AS BREAKING OF BREAD, GOSPEL PREACHING, BIBLE MINISTRY, BIBLE READING, WOMEN'S FELLOWSHIP AND SUNDAY SCHOOL REACHING OUT TO THE COMMUNITY, SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN MISSIONARY WORK (HOME & OVERSEAS)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- India
Governance
- 23 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJU ARUKALICKAL VARGHESE | Chair | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bennet Daniel Kurien | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benji Kunjachan Thomas | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
GLADIS ARACKAKUDIYIL JOHN | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
VARGHESE AREEKAL GEORGE | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.29k | £10.84k | £23.82k | £40.38k | £61.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.19k | £9.00k | £7.33k | £18.09k | £29.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 May 2021 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH) IN MANCHESTER AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Canterbury Close
Bamford
Rochdale
Greater Manchester
Greater Manchester
OL11 5LZ
- Phone:
- 07863650603
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window