HIGHAM AND RUSHDEN U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable purposes of The U3A are to advance education and in particular the education of people not in full time gainful employment who are in their Third Age (being the period of time after the first age of childhood dependence and the second age of full time employment and/or parental responsibility) residing in Higham Ferrers, Rushden and its surrounding locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 21 December 2015: Standard registration
- H & R U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Blanchard | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Anna McKeever | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Diane Gale | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fred Frost | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Evans | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Bird | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Dewar | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mole | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Anthony Boxall | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Sharp Morrison | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Morrison | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.77k | £8.02k | £3.88k | £4.68k | £7.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.68k | £7.75k | £2.52k | £5.92k | £6.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 July 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/03/2015 as amended on 08 May 2019
Charitable objects
i. the advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development, in Higham Ferrers, Rushden and the surrounding locality.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Grangeway
RUSHDEN
Northamptonshire
NN10 9JG
- Phone:
- 01933 522934
- Email:
- WEB@HANDRU3A.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window