ALTON GOLF CLUB ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Club are the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Alton and surrounding areas, by the provision of facilities for playing golf.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 April 2016: CIO registration
- 09 December 2016: Funds received from 1150265 ALTON GOLF CLUB ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Ransley | Chair | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Barrett | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hall | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andy Trimmer | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gill Neate | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Ireson | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Vasey | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Palmer | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Matthews | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Andrew Bentley | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.88k | £150.02k | £79.77k | £151.24k | £173.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.15k | £142.64k | £69.60k | £122.27k | £189.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £24.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 August 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 August 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Apr 2016 as amended on 04 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING OF GOLF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alton Golf Club
Old Odiham Road
ALTON
GU34 4BU
- Phone:
- 0142082724
- Email:
- admin@altongolfclub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window