THE IAN RITCHIE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in North Somerset, the charity operates an ongoing fundraising programme within the local community, to generate the funds required in meeting our primary, Cystic Fibrosis-related objectives across Southwest England. We also raise public awareness of the condition via events, social media presence and wide-spread literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 February 2016: CIO registration
- 28 July 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
- 28 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1017576 CYSTIC FIBROSIS COMFORT FUND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/09/2016 | 09/09/2017 | 09/09/2018 | 09/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.20k | £32.43k | £13.75k | £8.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.44k | £21.22k | £16.42k | £582 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 September 2019 | 10 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2019 | 10 April 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 09 September 2018 | 12 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2018 | 12 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 09 September 2017 | 14 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2017 | 14 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 09 September 2016 | 25 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2016 | 04 February 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
A)TO SUPPORT, PROMOTE & PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THOSE SUFFERING WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS (CF), AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN THE SOUTHWEST OF ENGLAND, AND PARTICULARLY THOSE UNDER THE CARE OF BRISTOL ROYAL INFIRMARY & BRISTOL CHILDRENS HOSPITAL SPECIALIST CF UNITS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND ADVICE. B)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CYSTIC FIBROSIS PATIENTS AT BRISTOL ROYAL INFIRMARY AND BRISTOL CHILDRENS HOSPITAL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. C)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CYSTIC FIBROSIS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window