Accounts and annual returns YORK LITERATURE FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1165936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 09 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 09 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 09 September 2024 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 09 September 2024 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 14 April 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 14 April 2023 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 April 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 01 April 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window