THE LIVER GROUP CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of The Liver Group Charity is to improve the treatment of liver disease through medical research funding, with a current focus of a Bio-Artificial Liver Machine. The research includes education and training of scientists, and research both at the laboratory and clinical interface. NB: 'THE LIVER GROUP CHARITY' (1166985) IS A CIO FORMERLY KNOWN AS 'THE LIVER GROUP' (1024533).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
Governance
- 06 May 2016: CIO registration
- 09 March 2017: Funds received from 1024533 THE LIVER GROUP
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR DAVID HOLBROOK | Chair | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Leah Henrietta Collier | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Martin Giles | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CLARE SELDEN PHD | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN EGGLETON | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kay Glendinning | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.52k | £36.32k | £17.45k | £45.68k | £19.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.07k | £173.49k | £134.09k | £188.54k | £154.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 May 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM DISEASE OF THE LIVER AND GENETIC DEFECTS AFFECTING THE LIVER. 2. THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF DISEASES OF THE LIVER ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED. 3. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO FUND AND SUPPORT EXISTING AND FUTURE RESEARCH INTO SUCH MATTERS AT UCL MEDICAL SCHOOL (LIVER GROUP) AT THE ROYAL FREE HOSPITAL OR ANY OTHER ESTABLISHMENT INTO WHICH SUCH UNIT MAY BE AMALGAMATED OR TRANSFERRED IN THE FUTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O INSTITUTE FOR LIVER AND
DIGESTIVE HEALTH
ROYAL FREE HOSPITAL CAMPUS
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE MEDICAL SCHOOL
ROWLAND HILL ST
HAMPSTEA
- Phone:
- 0208 016 8374
- Email:
- c.selden@ucl.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window