MANOR MISSION CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main aim is:- Knowing God, showing God and making God Known to our local community. We have 2 services on Sundays, Coffee morning every Monday, Mid week meetings. Messy Church every last Sunday of the month for Grandparents to toddlers and everyone in between. We reach out to the youth every Thursday evening through Xplore.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 09 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Alexander Schormans | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADERONKE OLASUNMIBO HANSON MAAT | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN MARSHALL QPM MSC | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER JUDITH Watts | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLIN CHARLES EVANS | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN MARSHALL | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.52k | £31.17k | £25.42k | £43.97k | £48.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.16k | £20.46k | £23.30k | £20.42k | £29.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19/12/1929
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES ON TRUSTEE FOR THE TIME BEING OF THIS DEED SHALL AT ALL TIMES HEREAFTER PERMIT AND SUFFER THE SAID LAND AND PREMISES TO BE USED AND OCCUPIED AND ENJOYED AS A PLACE FOR THE PUBLIC WORSHIP OF GOD AND FOR PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS(OBJECTS AS CORRECTED ON 9 MARCH 2016 BY APPLICATION OF THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS (VALIDATION) ACT 1954).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Road
Laindon
BASILDON
SS15 6PA
- Phone:
- 033388888888
- Email:
- MANORMISSION@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
WWW.MANORMISSIONCHURCH.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window