ST JOHN'S CHURCH PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restore and re-open to public St John's Church, Kates Hill, Dudley, West Midlands. Support Christian worship. Create wide variety of community activities including nature reserve. Create community information point. Create visitor destination enhancing local economy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dudley
Governance
- 14 December 2015: CIO registration
- SJCPG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH BROWNLEE MBA, MCMI | Chair | 14 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Kerr | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Kerr | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Bottley | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deb Brownlee | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN POOLE MBAMRSMCIM | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HORWOOD | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.72k | £16.41k | £26.83k | £14.46k | £17.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.41k | £8.42k | £16.35k | £19.62k | £18.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 March 2022 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 12 March 2022 | 163 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 15 December 2020 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 15 December 2020 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF ST JOHN'S CHURCH PRESERVATION GROUP ARE: (A) TO SUPPORT THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF ST JOHN?S CHURCH, KATES HILL, DUDLEY, A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE WITH A VIEW TO SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND PROVIDING A FACILITY FOR GREATER COMMUNITY USE; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (I) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS AND (II) BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS; (D) TO FURTHER BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF DUDLEY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR UNWAGED AND THOSE WHO ARE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS; (E) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old School House
St John's Road
Kates Hill
Dudley
West Midlands
DY2 7JT
- Phone:
- 07522184461
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window