Financial history RA MESS, ROYAL ARTILLERY BARRACKS, LARKHILL

Charity Number: 1165096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £63.68k £67.98k £123.72k £86.06k £86.48k
Total expenditure £65.16k £36.00k £109.46k £88.56k £85.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A