DESTINY LIFE CHURCH LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith through our Sunday services, Connect Groups and outreach opportunities. Our children's church work has grown. We support missions by regularly giving each month to their work. We run a weekly Bible study group . Our discipleship course that we are working through as a church is on being emotionally and spiritually healthy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 07 June 2016: Standard registration
- 29 November 2017: Funds received from 1084075 HOUSE OF DESTINY CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Timms | Chair | 01 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Baker | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charis Fay | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lawrence | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Nigel Dicker | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.49k | £92.19k | £119.66k | £103.99k | £126.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.78k | £96.88k | £99.04k | £109.01k | £113.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUL 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH THROUGH: (A) WORSHIP, PREACHING AND TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND FELLOWSHIP AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF BIBLE TEACHING IN ALL FORMS OF MEDIA, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH GENERALLY (B) THE INSTRUCTION AND CARE OF CHRISTIANS INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN (C) THE EVANGELISM OF NON-CHRISTIANS (D) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, POVERTY OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Destiny Life Church
25A Elliott Road
West Howe Industrial Estate
BOURNEMOUTH
BH11 8LQ
- Phone:
- 07788286102
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window