THE 2874 TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising awareness of our current project, promoting membership of the charity and raising funds - the project being to progress the restoration of a unique, 1918 built Great Western heavy freight steam locomotive
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
Governance
- 30 March 2016: Standard registration
- THE 2874 TRUST LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger William Tipton | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Hallett | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Wigg | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Martin Ginger | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Keith Neil George Smith | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL HOLMES | Trustee | 17 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALEXANDER SAMPSON | Trustee | 17 October 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID HAROLD FOSTER | Trustee | 27 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.14k | £60.41k | £27.91k | £38.99k | £24.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.68k | £42.47k | £26.98k | £52.56k | £19.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.96k | N/A | £5.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 AUG 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ACQUIRE, RESTORE, PRESERVE, DISPLAY, OPERATE AND MAINTAIN EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY LENDING OUT HERITAGE RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES, TENDERS, COACHES, WAGONS AND ALL MANNER OF RAILWAY ARTEFACTS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE EXPRESS STEAM HEAVY FREIGHT LOCOMOTIVE NUMBER 2874. 2. TO PROVIDE ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND CERTIFICATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE PRACTICALITIES, TECHNIQUES AND METHODS USED IN THE OBJECTS DESCRIBED AT PARAGRAPH 4(1). 3. TO USE THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY TO PROMOTE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORICAL, SCIENTIFIC AND CULTURAL ASPECTS OF THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY, WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO ITS HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 SOUTH PARK
MINEHEAD
TA24 8AL
- Phone:
- 07790873421
- Email:
- Enquiries@2874trust.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window