HEREWARD MEDIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and training of the inhabitants of Peterborough and its surrounding areas in broadcasting and audio, video and media skills techniques
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 01 August 2016: Standard registration
- 28 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HEREWARD MEDIA (PETERBOROUGH) LTD (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.10k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE INHABITANTS OF PETERBOROUGH AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS IN BROADCASTING AND AUDIO, VIDEO AND MEDIA SKILLS TECHNIQUES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window