JEWISH ORTHODOX FEMINIST ALLIANCE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to advance Orthodox Judaism and to promote the equality of women and their role within Orthodox Judaism to the fullest extent that it is possible within the framework of Halakha (Orthodox Jewish law).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 2016: CIO registration
- JOFA UK (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EVE SACKS | Chair | 29 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Laurie Scher | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
NEIL SIMON HAMBURGER | Trustee | 31 December 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £383 | £764 | £3.91k | £74 | £76 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.42k | £3.29k | £2.55k | £2.20k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE ORTHODOX JUDAISM AND TO PROMOTE THE EQUALITY OF WOMEN AND THEIR ROLE WITHIN ORTHODOX JUDAISM TO THE FULLEST EXTENT THAT IT IS POSSIBLE WITHIN THE FRAMEWORK OF HALAKHA (ORTHODOX JEWISH LAW), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) RAISING AWARENESS WITHIN THE ORTHODOX JEWISH COMMUNITY OF THE RITUAL PARTICIPATION IN SYNAGOGUES, RITUAL SPACES AND COMMUNAL LEADERSHIP ROLES PERMITTED TO WOMEN WITHIN HALAKHA; (B) ENABLING AND FACILITATING WOMEN'S RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, RITUAL PARTICIPATION IN SYNAGOGUES AND COMMUNAL LEADERSHIP ROLES AND FUNCTIONS TO THE FULLEST EXTENT POSSIBLE WITHIN HALAKHA; AND (C) ADVOCATING FOR THE INTERPRETATION OF HALAKHA IN A WAY WHICH FACILITATES GREATER FEMALE PARTICIPATION IN RELIGIOUS RITUAL AND BOTH RELIGIOUS AND LAY COMMUNAL LEADERSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Shirehall Lane
Hendon
London
NW4 2PE
- Phone:
- 07720401456
- Email:
- eve.sacks@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window