Financial history CARLISLE FOODBANK

Charity Number: 1165332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £152.81k £207.43k £261.55k £369.14k £354.48k
Total expenditure £128.14k £129.92k £235.52k £311.02k £315.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.50k £13.80k £24.86k N/A