THE GRANTHAM CANAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion support and facilitation of the restoration maintenance use and enjoyment of Inland Waterways and in particular the Grantham Canal
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 March 1978: Standard registration
- GRANTHAM CANAL RESTORATION SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE STONE | Chair | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Christopher Goody | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Steven Gordon | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Osbond | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Grylls | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Noble | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.67k | £50.99k | £59.82k | £110.47k | £180.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.89k | £18.64k | £79.65k | £38.73k | £78.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 DECEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVOCATE AND PROMOTE THE RESTORATION TO GOOD ORDER AND CONDITION AND THE MAINTENANCE IN GOOD ORDER AND CONDITION OF THE GRANTHAM CANAL.
Area of benefit
GRANTHAM TO NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Somersby Consulting Ltd.
Unit 2
Sherbrook Enterprise
100 Sherbrook Road
Nottingh
- Phone:
- 01159313375
- Email:
- chairman@granthamcanal.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window