Accounts and annual returns 307 SQUADRON PROJECT

Charity Number: 1167606
Charity reporting is overdue by 928 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days
Annual return 01 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 563 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 563 days
Annual return 01 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 928 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 928 days
Annual return 01 January 2021 04 April 2022 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 04 April 2022 154 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2020 31 March 2021 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 31 March 2021 150 days late Download Open in new window