GAS-MINISTERE CHRIST NOTRE RESTAURATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church organisation providing charitable services to our disadvantaged local community in particular and to the wide public in general, living in West Midlands. We aim to advance Christian religion and promote integration of our members in the UK, by the provision of advices and guidance on issues such as educational, immigration, housing, debt management, health and wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 22 March 2016: Standard registration
- GAS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAUDE KALENGA KABONGO | Chair | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Kanza-Yobi | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK SALI MASS | Trustee | 20 October 2013 |
|
|||||
PATIENCE ZOLA | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.01k | £7.01k | £6.80k | £6.80k | £4.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £3.00k | £5.00k | £5.20k | £2.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 19 July 2023 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 26 June 2021 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED ON 14/03/2016
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF GAS-CHRIST NOTRE RESTAURATION [GAS] IS TO MAKE A POSITIVE CHANGE TO THE LIVES OF LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN PARTICULAR AND OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, LIVING IN THE AREAS OF WEST MIDLANDS, THROUGH THE FOLLOWING OBJECTIVES: 3.1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC LIVING IN BIRMINGHAM IN PARTICULAR AND WEST MIDLANDS IN GENERAL, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED HERETO 3.2. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF LOCAL PEOPLE LIVING IN BIRMINGHAM IN PARTICULAR AND WEST MIDLANDS IN GENERAL 3.3. THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR LOCAL PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR HEALTH, CULTURAL AND SOCIAL BACKGROUND, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. THE FACILITIES WILL BE PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES. 3.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE PERSONS DEFINED IN OBJECT 3.1 AS BENEFICIARIES BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE 3.5 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO THOSE PERSONS DEFINED IN OBJECT 3.1 AS BENEFICIARIES BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS THAT TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
IN BIRMINGHAM IN PARTICULAR AND WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Endwood court Road
Handsworth Wood
B21 9NS
- Phone:
- 07424544195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window