TOGETHER NORFOLK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Imagine Norfolk Together is a joint venture between the Church Urban Fund and the Diocese of Norwich Our aim is to celebrate and support the work of local Christians in their community by Providing churches with support as they develop and deliver social action initiatives Running workshops, training and events in order to build people's capacity to take action Developing local partnerships
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 05 April 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rt Revd Dr Jane Steen | Chair | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Matthew Price | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Kyla Sorenson | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Canon Aiden Stephen George Platten | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Worsley | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Canon Simon Ward | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev PETER HOWARD | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev JAMES WILIAM STEWART | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.00k | £52.55k | £52.17k | £44.92k | £46.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.00k | £52.55k | £52.17k | £44.92k | £46.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 AUG 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY?S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHRISTIAN BASED CHARITIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS OR ANY ONE OF THEM, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFRASTRUCTURE PROVISION; AND 3.2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Diocese of Norwich
Diocesan House
109 Dereham Road
Easton
NORWICH
- Phone:
- 01603882377
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
dioceseofnorwich.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window