BRISTOL SAMBA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie East | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Derrick | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gleed | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hare | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Paessler | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Walford | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Badman | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Spoto | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lois Cox | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Traceydawn White | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracy Whale | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Elliott | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Chapman | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE AXFORD | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.39k | £13.70k | £9.75k | £24.09k | £29.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.89k | £15.98k | £7.18k | £23.63k | £29.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY COMMUNITY ARTS LTD
THE TRINITY CENTRE
TRINITY ROAD
BRISTOL
BS2 0NW
- Phone:
- 01179351200
- Email:
- admin@bristolsamba.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window