THE CURLEW COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO MAINTAIN A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE PEOPLE OF SUTTON BRIDGE AND IT'S LOCALLITY. WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 08 January 2016: CIO registration
- 04 May 2021: Funds received from 1076313 SUNBEAMS (SUTTON BRIDGE)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ROBERT WILLIAM EVERITT | Chair | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stafford Proctor | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Adrian Cooper | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER AGAR CLERY | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
NEIL DENNIS WRIGHT | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MIDDLETON | Trustee | 08 January 2016 |
|
|||||
CHRIS BRANDON-KING | Trustee | 08 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.90k | £50.34k | £53.12k | £82.24k | £101.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.15k | £39.95k | £46.48k | £65.08k | £61.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 August 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 August 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO MAINTAIN A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE PEOPLE OF SUTTON BRIDGE AND ITS LOCALITY, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS, WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION OF ANY KIND, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANIZATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Curlew Centre
51 Bridge Road
Sutton Bridge
SPALDING
PE12 9SA
- Phone:
- 01406365879
- Email:
- admin@thecurlewcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window