Accounts and annual returns GRAHAM AND DIANNE ROBERTS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Charity Number: 1166906

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 17 December 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 17 December 2024 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window