MIRACLE'S MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Non profit animal welfare organisation that works with sick, injured and difficult animals around the world. Our mission is to provide a place of safety for animals in danger, to educate on the need for neutering both pets and strays and to neuter stray dogs and cats to prevent the birth of more dogs and cats onto the streets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Egypt
- Malaysia
Governance
- 17 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA BRYCESON | Chair | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Miles | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Pamer Wheeler | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE BRYCESON | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.90k | £305.19k | £255.80k | £157.64k | £151.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.41k | £85.31k | £124.82k | £138.17k | £143.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DEC 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SCHOOL ROAD
CARLISLE
CA1 3LX
- Phone:
- 07590621062
- Email:
- info@miraclesmission.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window