GUYS AND ST THOMAS' HOSPITAL KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PATIENTS OF GUY'S AND ST THOMAS' HOSPITAL, AND THEIR SATELLITE UNITS AND THE EVELINA LONDON CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY DISEASE OR KIDNEY FAILURE AND TO SUPPORT RESEARCH AT GUY'S AND ST THOMAS' HOSPITAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
- Southwark
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 March 2016: Standard registration
- 09 October 2020: Funds received from 285086 GUY'S AND ST. THOMAS' HOSPITAL KIDNEY PATIENTS' AS...
- GSTTKPA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Peter Richard Harrison | Chair | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Niraj Sureshchandra Vershi Haria | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hadizat Olanrewaju | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
TERESA ANNE DURKIN | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE LEOPOLD BROWN | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.64k | £85.75k | £32.41k | £60.80k | £128.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.86k | £14.31k | £33.06k | £36.64k | £62.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PATIENTS OF GUY'S AND ST THOMAS' HOSPITAL, AND THEIR SATELLITE UNITS AND THE EVELINA LONDON CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY DISEASE OR KIDNEY FAILURE AND TO SUPPORT RESEARCH AT GUY'S AND ST THOMAS'HOSPITAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GSTTKPA
C/O RENAL OFFICES
6th FLOOR
BOROUGH WING
GUY'S HOSPITAL
GREAT MA
- Phone:
- 02071887552
- Email:
- info@gsttkpa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window