Financial history POWYS SAMARITANS IN LLANDRINDOD WELLS

Charity Number: 1165036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.01k £330.51k £42.05k £65.52k £112.57k
Total expenditure £38.74k £409.29k £39.70k £118.47k £53.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £100 £250.00k £250 £250 £250