Trustees POWYS SAMARITANS IN LLANDRINDOD WELLS
Charity Number: 1165036

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Kirstyn Williams CBE | Chair | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Julia Roberts | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MARY KING OBE | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Jane Dornan | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Jays | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Mary Jones | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Adrian King | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Laurence Davies | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.