SAMARITANS OF EXETER MID AND EAST DEVON

Charity number: 1165042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Samaritans is a registered charity aimed at providing emotional support to anyone in emotional distress, struggling to cope, or at risk of suicide throughout the United Kingdom and Ireland

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £132,340
Total expenditure: £96,085

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Harvey Trustee 15 July 2024
None on record
Lucy Neal Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Tony Fripp Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Helen Crossfield Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Veronica Davies Trustee 27 August 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.12k £48.52k £129.97k £121.13k £132.34k
Total expenditure £52.43k £41.93k £92.61k £118.09k £96.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.64k £18.94k £4.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 31 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO ENABLE PERSONS IN EXETER, MID AND EAST DEVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS WELL AS ELSEWHERE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING FEELINGS OF DISTRESS OR DESPAIR, INCLUDING THOSE WHO MAY BE AT RISK OF SUICIDE, TO RECEIVE CONFIDENTIAL EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AT ANY TIME OF THE DAY OR NIGHT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND TO REDUCE THE INCIDENCE OF SUICIDE; 2.2 TO PROMOTE A BETTER UNDERSTANDING IN SOCIETY OF SUICIDE, SUICIDAL BEHAVIOUR AND THE VALUE OF EXPRESSING FEELINGS WHICH MAY OTHERWISE LEAD TO SUICIDE OR IMPAIRED EMOTIONAL HEALTH; AND 2.3 TO COLLABORATE WITH AND SUPPORT SAMARITANS CENTRAL CHARITY AND ITS AFFILIATED BRANCHES IN FULFILLING THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
EXETER, MID AND EAST DEVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 20 August 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
SAMARITANS
10 RICHMOND ROAD
EXETER
EX4 4JA
Phone:
01392 496649