GUILDFORD SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1165037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We enable persons in the Guildford and surrounding area and elsewhere who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, to receive confidential emotional support at any time of the day or night in order to improve their emotional health and to reduce the incidence of suicide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £103,054
Total expenditure: £148,466

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chloe Alexia Metcalfe Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Heather Fisk Trustee 14 April 2023
None on record
Laura Josephine Spoelstra Trustee 27 October 2022
None on record
Allen Robert Ruddock Trustee 27 October 2022
None on record
Rupi Zani Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Douglas Peter Hewson Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Joanna Claire Titcomb Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £93.32k £97.71k £112.43k £134.60k £103.05k
Total expenditure £265.02k £101.19k £251.22k £184.06k £148.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.48k £6.36k £6.10k £4.33k £4.08k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 01 APR 2016
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN GUILDFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY GUILDFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 12 August 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
GUILDFORD SAMARITANS
69 WOODBRIDGE ROAD
GUILDFORD
GU1 4RD
Phone:
116123