HOLY FAMILY ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH SERVICES, PRAYER MEETINGS, PRAISE AND WORSHIP BIBLE STUDIES AND FELLOWSHIP YOUTH CLUB ACTIVITIES INTEGRATION AND CULTURA ACTIVITIES FOOD BANK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 24 February 2016: CIO registration
- HOLY CHURCH (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLY KALAMBAYI NGANDU | Chair | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MUKADI NGANDU | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ULRICH MITH MIAYOUKOU | Trustee | 19 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.23k | £3.64k | £0 | £279 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.38k | £4.06k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 December 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 December 2021 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC :- TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 WOODCOCK PLACE
SHEFFIELD
S2 5BW
- Phone:
- 07957515621
- Email:
- holychurch2000@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window