Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF MAIDENHEAD BRIDGE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1166101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.56k £18.54k £7.23k £17.01k £19.03k
Total expenditure £4.76k £16.29k £9.65k £22.14k £19.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 £6.00k N/A N/A N/A