THE AVANT-GARDE ART RESEARCH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RARP was established to encourage and advance the wider understanding of the Russian avant-garde through the scholarly application of art historical and technological research. In furtherance of this aim RARP makes grants to suitably qualified individuals and institutions engaged in the field so as to enable them to undertake high-quality research that may not otherwise be eligible for funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 22 January 2016: Standard registration
- RARP (Working name)
- THE RUSSIAN AVANT-GARDE RESEARCH PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wilhelmus Johannes Franciscus Maria RENDERS | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
VIVIAN ENDICOTT BARNETT | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KONSTANTIN AKINSHA | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr NATALIA VLADIMIROVNA MURRAY MURRAY | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.70k | £0 | £31.14k | £24.16k | £14.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.48k | £20.67k | £24.33k | £29.26k | £15.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAR 2014 as amended on 01 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF TECHNOLOGICAL AND ART HISTORICAL RESEARCH INTO THE RUSSIAN AVANT-GARDE AND ITS CONTEXT, AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Park Road
Hampton Wick
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT1 4AS
- Phone:
- 02089770905
- Email:
- elena@theaarp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window