THE WIGGIN FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purpose
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PETER WIGGIN | Chair | 20 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Kiki Louisa Wiggin | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN EMMA WIGGIN | Trustee | 20 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PETER WIGGIN | Trustee | 20 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ROBERT WIGGIN | Trustee | 20 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.01k | £11.94k | £11.10k | £13.85k | £23.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND MEDICAL RESEARCH (A) THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE UK; AND (B) TO PROMOTE MEDICAL RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT EITHER DIRECTLY BY MAKING RESEARCH GRANTS OR INDIRECTLY BY MAKING DONATIONS TO OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES UNDERTAKING APPROPRIATE PROJECTS AND WHO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. 3.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND (B) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES - IN THE UK AND ABROAD - THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD. 3.3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE. 3.4 THE CARE OF ANIMALS (A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE MEDICAL VETERINARY RESEARCH INTO ANIMAL ILLNESSES AND DISEASES; (B) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL-USAGE; AND (C) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. 3.5 THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY UK PRIMARY OR SECONDARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL; (B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY. (I) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. (II) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (C) TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES. (D) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE LEARNING BY PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING IN SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE. 3.6 THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN (A) THE RELIEF OF NEED, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF THOSE SERVING IN OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE UK'S ARMED FORCES. (B) TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE UK'S ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS THROUGH:- (I) WELFARE ADVICE AND SUPPORT; AND (II) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (C) TO SUPPORT REGIMENTAL MUSEUMS WHICH ARE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC AND OTHER TRUST FUNDS WHICH UPHOLD THE TRADITIONS OF MILITARY REGIMENTS AND OTHER UNITS THROUGH PERPETUATING THEIR DEEDS, PURCHASING UNIFORMS, MEDALS, PICTURES,BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, MAPS, DOCUMENTS AND OTHER ARTICLES WHICH ARE, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, IN THE SPIRIT AND INTENT OF THE CHARITY. (D) TO SUPPORT OTHER CHARITIES PROVIDING CHARITABLE SERVICES TO SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE UK'S ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION AND THE SOLDIERS, SAILORS, AIRMEN AND FAMILIES ASSOCIATION - FORCES HELP, HELP FOR HEROES AND INDIVIDUAL REGIMENTAL AND OTHER MILITARY CHARITIES. 3.7 ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE MAKING OF DONATIONS TO ANY OTHER CHARITABLE TRUST OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THOSE OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parsonage Farm
Bentworth
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 5RB
- Phone:
- 01420 562175
- Email:
- wigginhome@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window