SWINDON (DEVIZES ROAD) SPIRITUALIST CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold religious service. Support and counselling. Healing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAJORIE OLIVE JEFFERIES | Chair | 03 April 1988 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Reed Mr | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Barnes | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE BARNES | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA CLAIRE PLUMB | Trustee | 05 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA CAROL GOODEN | Trustee | 03 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GRAHAM PLUMB | Trustee | 03 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
KEITH DAVID HENDERSON | Trustee | 03 April 1988 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET OLIVE MEAD | Trustee | 03 April 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.04k | £7.70k | £12.00k | £11.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.99k | £12.30k | £7.00k | £6.00k | £14.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2023 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2021 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2021 | 355 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Farmhouse
Ypres Road
Chiseldon
SWINDON
Wiltshire
SN4 0JF
- Phone:
- 01793486777
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window