HOLKHAM WALLED GARDEN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holkham Walled Garden is the body which oversees the management, restoration and preservation of the Grade II listed Walled Garden at Holkham Hall, Wells-next-the-Sea, Norfolk NR23 1AB. Its objectives are to sustain the heritage and the physical and natural environment of the Garden and to facilitate the use and enjoyment of the Garden by members of the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 May 2016: Standard registration
- 26 May 2021: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.07k | £1.70k | £3.19k | £270 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 May 2021 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 4.1 OVERSEEING THE MANAGEMENT, RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE GRADE II* LISTED WALLED GARDEN AT HOLKHAM, HOLKHAM HALL, WELLS-NEXT-THE-SEA, NORFOLK NR23 1AB (THE "GARDEN"); 4.2 SUSTAINING THE HERITAGE AND THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE GARDEN; 4.3 FACILITATING AND ENCOURAGING THE USE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE GARDEN BY MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC; 4.4 PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND COURSES FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE GARDEN (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, COURSES IN HORTICULTURE, HERITAGE SKILLS, FLORISTRY AND ARTS AND CRAFTS).
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window