THE MAYOR OF PETERBOROUGH'S CHARITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mayor of Peterborough chooses local charities to raise money throughout their term in office,this is done by donations and holding events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 18 February 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christabel Saltmarsh | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gul Nawaz | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Edwards | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.00k | £1.31k | £19.33k | £25.16k | £34.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.98k | £0 | £4.31k | £40.52k | £12.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 30 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 14 April 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/12/2015
Charitable objects
THAT INCOME WILL BE GENERATED THROUGH FUNDRAISING EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE CITY OF PETERBOROUGH WHICH ARE ORGANISED BY THE MAYOR OF PETERBOROUGH'S CHARITY FUND AND FROM DONATIONS BY INDIVIDUALS AND LOCAL ORGANISATIONS. THE INCOME IS APPLIED TO SUPPORT THE MAYOR'S NOMINATED LOCAL CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WITHIN THE CITY OF PETERBOROUGH OR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PROJECTS WHICH THE MAYOR OF PETERBOROUGH'S CHARITY FUND DEEM WORTHY AND TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CIVIC OFFICE
MAYOR'S PARLOUR
THE TOWN HALL
BRIDGE STREET
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 1HG
- Phone:
- 01733 452319
- Email:
- MAYOR@PETERBOROUGH.GOV.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window