Financial history BRIDPORT AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity Number: 1165000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.76k £7.68k £8.28k £11.66k £13.02k
Total expenditure £6.37k £8.88k £10.75k £8.33k £10.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A