ACTON SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold Spiritualist Church services every Wednesday at 7.30 pm to 9 pm and the 1st Sunday in every month at 6.30 to 8 pm. Every Thursday evening we give Spiritual Healing to all who attend 7.30 to 8.30 pm. all our services are freewill offering. We try to help anyone who comes through our doors who is troubled in some way or another, either by talking or offering that they come for healing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Grant | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Kebell | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Bailey | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.34k | £42.01k | £25.82k | £37.36k | £51.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.09k | £14.10k | £18.51k | £25.32k | £18.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 January 2025 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 January 2025 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2024 | 387 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2024 | 387 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2022 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2022 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cottage
Woodhurst Road
Acton
LONDON
W3 6SL
- Phone:
- 02088960184
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window