Financial history WALLASEY SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1164997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.08k £2.53k £8.25k £9.06k £14.08k
Total expenditure £3.17k £3.76k £6.44k £9.58k £10.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A