Accounts and annual returns FLORA GARDENS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1165974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 February 2024 17 January 2025 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2023 17 January 2025 400 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2021 14 November 2022 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2020 Not Required