FRIENDS OF MARSABIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion in the Anglican Diocese of Marsabit in Kenya by: 1. The provision of grants or other assets. 2. Support to local communities within the said diocese to facilitate their survival, education, health, social and spiritual welfare or economic wellbeing. 3. Promoting a wider understanding of the problems facing the peoples of N Kenya.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kenya
Governance
- 10 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RT REVD ROBERT MARTIN | Chair | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexander Muchiri Cendi | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Venerable Ruth Patten | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|||||
SUSAN MARTIN | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH WADLAND | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lee Batson | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Philip Gray | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.66k | £85.56k | £75.20k | £52.32k | £51.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.03k | £79.63k | £88.70k | £52.98k | £56.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE ANGLICAN DIOCESE OF MARSABIT IN KENYA OR SUCH AREAS OF KENYA THAT SHALL INCLUDE THE AREA NOW COMPRISED IN THE SAID DIOCESE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH 1. THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR OTHER ASSETS. 2. SUPPORT TO LOCAL COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE SAID DIOCESE OR AREAS COVERED BY THE PRESENT DIOCESAN BOUNDARIES TO FACILITATE THEIR SURVIVAL, EDUCATION, HEALTH, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OR ECONOMIC WELLBEING. 3. PROMOTING A WIDER UNDERSTANDING OF THE PROBLEMS FACING THE PEOPLES OF NORTHERN KENYA IN RELATION TO ENVIRONMENTAL DEGRADATION, CLIMATE CHANGE, TENSIONS, TRADITIONAL PRACTICES ETC
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Blackberry Road
FROME
BA11 5DF
- Phone:
- 07986326558
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window