HOUSE OF JOY SOUTH WALES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
House of Joy has built classrooms, toilets, kitchen, teacher's accommodation in Kasala Uganda where our sister charity, House of Joy Uganda, run a school for primary children. This involves supporting teachers, providing clean drinking water and giving all the children at least one meal a day. Kasala is one of the poorest villages in Uganda. We raise funds in the UK to support this work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Caerphilly
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 May 2016: CIO registration
- 04 January 2017: Funds received from 1109560 HOUSE OF JOY, SOUTH WALES
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to
- 17 June 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.10k | £47.18k | £52.47k | £54.95k | £43.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.08k | £45.08k | £56.38k | £39.84k | £47.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 37 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 May 2016
Charitable objects
A)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SOUTH WALES AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, UGANDA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS AND TO TRAIN, EDUCATE AND SUPPORT CHRISTIAN WORKERS THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COLLEGES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, UGANDA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, UGANDA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. D TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window