CODNOR CASTLE HERITAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1169630
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising awareness of the Castle.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £2,885
Total expenditure: £3,403

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 October 2016: CIO registration
  • 06 November 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 06 November 2023: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CCHT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £17.91k £7.12k £8.32k £2.22k £2.89k
Total expenditure £4.31k £9.30k £10.65k £5.50k £3.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 07 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 May 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On Time