Trustees FRIENDS OF ROCK ROAD LIBRARY
Charity number: 1166498

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Howarth | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wilson-Howarth | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL ELIZABETH TREND | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ARTHUR BLACKMORE | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALWYN SYDNEY JOHN AXE | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROBERT BERRY | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA ANNE PURKISS | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALEC WILLIAM THOMAS DYSON | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE HELEN MINNEY BOYD | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.