Governing document THE FRIENDS OF LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE MUSEUMS
Charity Number: 507376
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1978 AMENDED 4 JUNE 1981, 28 JUNE 1984, JUNE 1991, 4 JUNE 1992 AND 13 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FRIENDS SHALL BE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES AND RECORDS OFFICES IN LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LEICESTERSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.