Accounts and annual returns UNDER ONE ROOF

Charity Number: 1168415
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 January 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 04 January 2019 03 March 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2019 03 March 2020 120 days late
Annual return 04 January 2018 22 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2018 22 October 2018 On Time